Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guerrero Yolanda, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lipeles Kevin A. Esq., against Best Western Posada Royale Hotel And, Khan Hotels Inc, represented by Fisher & Phillips Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
This complaint is filed by Yolanda Guerrero against Khan Hotels, Inc., doing business as Best Western Posada Royale Hotel and Suites, and other unnamed defendants. Yolanda Guerrero alleges three causes of action: physical disability discrimination, f...
Complaint
Date: January 11, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: January 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF PREJUDICE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)
Date: January 17, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: January 17, 2018Minute Order -
Date: January 22, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2018NOTICE OF RULING ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT
Date: February 06, 2018NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: February 15, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 27, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: April 03, 2018ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT KHAN HOTELS, INC.
Date: April 03, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 11, 2018NOTICE RE; CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: June 19, 2018NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTIVE
Date: August 09, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: September 07, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Filing
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 07, 2018Receipt
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 09, 2018Answer
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.