Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Villegas Luis, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Ballister Raymond George Jr, against California State Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial; Filed by: Luis Villegas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Luis Villegas (Plaintiff); As to: California, State of (Defendant)
Date: September 16, 2019Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Luis Villegas (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00RULING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Luis Villegas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: January 11, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 30, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 15, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 16, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 16, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: March 28, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 13, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: April 13, 2018Order - RULING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2018Minute Order - (Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave)
Date: October 05, 2018Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial
Date: October 18, 2018Amended Complaint - (Amended)
Date: October 05, 2018Notice - NOTICE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS & CONCLUSIONS
Date: March 29, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 29, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 20, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: July 12, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief And Damages...
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00RULING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice (statement of uncontroverted facts & conclusions)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/20/2019)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.