Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bedrosian Harout, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Burunsuzyan Maro Esq., against Broukhim Behrooz M.D., represented by Taggart Deborah S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
SUMMONS -
Date: January 05, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 27, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE)
Date: January 05, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 03, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 09/16/2019
Date: September 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 16, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2019Answer
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 09/16/2019)
Date: September 16, 2019Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: September 16, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: September 16, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.