Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Molinaro Michael M. Esq., Molinaso Michael M., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Andreas Caressa, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Los Angeles City Of, Los Angeles Police Department, Prime Health Care Services - Encino Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management790 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: January 02, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 14, 2019SUMMONS -
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS...)
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: December 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 02, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 03, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/22/2020
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 07, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL
Date: November 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION)
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION)
Date: November 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION)
Date: January 22, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: February 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/08/2021
Date: February 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 18, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2021
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 02, 2021Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: April 01, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: March 23, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 21, 2021Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: July 02, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B311535
Date: September 15, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/22/2020)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution) of 11/19/2020)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer And Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/08/2021)
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Set Aside Order of Dismissal of ...))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Court Order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/07/2020)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution) of 01/22/2021)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution) of 11/16/2020)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to OSC re Dismissal)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/02/2021)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.