Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gerry David Dewitt, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gold Michael Alexander, against Dignity Health Dba Glendale Memorial Hospital And Health Center, Glendale Memorial Hospital And Health Center, Gregg K. Nishi M.D.. A California Professional Corporation, Hernia Institute Of Beverly Hills, Mihranian Mardiros H. M.D., (total of 6) See All represented by Lynch Gregory Gordon Esq., Packer Robert Bruce Esq., Ryan Richard James Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Jury Instructions; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Objection to Declaration of Eric D Morse, M.D. Filed by: Mardiros H. M.D. Mihranian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice Proposed Amended Joint Witness List; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order - Granted ($500); Filed by: Mardiros H. M.D. Mihranian (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00[PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASES; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6); Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Gregg K. Nishi, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Memorandum DAVIT DEWITT GERRY'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Objection To Notice Of Intention; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Mardiros H. M.D. Mihranian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: David Dewitt Gerry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 18, 2019Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions GIVEN; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Mardiros H. Mihranian, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM
Date: September 04, 2018INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Refund / Order - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER - GRANTED ($500)
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 08, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 08, 2019Notice - Notice Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 08, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 08, 2019Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF DAVID DEWITT GERRY'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: April 03, 2019Memorandum - MEMORANDUM DAVIT DEWITT GERRY'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 03, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 03, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 03, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ERIC D MORSE, M.D.
Date: April 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: June 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 02, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: July 02, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 11, 2019Exhibit List
Date: August 27, 2019Witness List
Date: August 27, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: August 27, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: August 27, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: August 28, 2019Trial Brief
Date: September 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: August 29, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE LIMITING TESTIMONY OF EXPERT WITNESSES AT THE TIME OF TRIAL
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE LIABILITY INSURANCE COVERAGE
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE RE EXPERTS PERSONAL PRACTICES
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: September 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: September 05, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: September 05, 2019Trial Brief
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: September 05, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: September 05, 2019Statement of the Case
Date: September 06, 2019Trial Brief
Date: September 09, 2019Trial Brief
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 12, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF SEPARATELY REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: September 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF INTENTION TO OFFER VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: September 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF INTENTION
Date: September 19, 2019Exhibit List
Date: September 23, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF INTENTION
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE TO LODGE ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AT TRIAL
Date: September 19, 2019Other - - ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: September 24, 2019Statement of the Case - [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASES
Date: September 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE PROPOSED AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: September 27, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 07, 2019Order - Dismissal
Date: October 08, 2019Special Verdict
Date: October 09, 2019Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS GIVEN
Date: October 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 09, 2019Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: October 09, 2019Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 10, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED
Date: October 16, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: October 18, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT ON NON-SUIT AND SPECIAL VERDICT
Date: October 18, 2019Judgment - AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: October 18, 2019Complaint
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (- Granted ($500))
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interro...))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice (Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Memorandum (DAVIT DEWITT GERRY'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF DAVID DEWITT GERRY'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Eric D Morse, M.D.)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION REQUESTING ORDER TO CONTINUE)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application requesting order to continue ...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Minute Order Dated May 24, 2019, Continuing Final Status Conference and Trial Date
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (In Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Experts Personal Practices)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Pre-Conditioning Jurors During Voir Dire With Hypothetical or Dollar Figures)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Limiting Testimony Of Expert Witnesses at the Time of Trial)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Re Liability Insurance Coverage)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Intention)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Of Separately Requested Jury Instructions)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Objection (To Notice Of Intention)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice (of Intention to offer Video Deposition)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice To Lodge Original Deposition Transcripts At Trial)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice (Proposed Amended Joint Witness List)
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Levanas, Dept. D, Santa Monica, OTR on 09/30/19 at 9:00 a.m.)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00[PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASES
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (- Karen Vilicich CSR#7634)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Order on Motion
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN)
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Judgment (on non-suit and special verdict)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Amended Proposed Judgment
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.