Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Awi Builders Inc., D.D. Reinforcing, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schauer Robert F., against Arch Insurance Company, Awi Builders Inc., City Of Los Angeles Board Of Recreation A, The Hanover Insurance, represented by Feldman Mark Allen, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management262 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: December 20, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: September 17, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 03, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: July 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE)
Date: December 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF THE ORDER GRANTING THE EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 13, 2019Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: January 27, 2020Trial Brief
Date: January 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID J. SIRE RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 03, 2020Witness List
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND VACATING DATES)
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/05/2021
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 05, 2021Trial Brief
Date: January 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 03, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; MSC SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE ; OSC RE DISMISSAL-SETTLEMENT [??])
Date: December 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; MEDIATION SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 23, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW (DEPT. 58 TO MAKE ARRANGEMENTS FOR...)
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 24, 2022Stipulation Re: Settlement Conference
Date: October 25, 2022Trial Brief
Date: November 17, 2022Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: November 17, 2022Exhibit List - JOINT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO C...)
Date: November 17, 2022Trial Brief
Date: November 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 11/22/2022
Date: November 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 22, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 06, 2023Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 06, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: March 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 22, 2018REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -
Date: April 04, 2018Minute Order -
Date: May 08, 2018FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.
Date: July 03, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 17, 2018ORDER RE NON-JURY TRIAL SETTING AND TRIAL. PREPARATION
Date: September 17, 2018Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice Notice of Trial and Final Status Conference; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Joint Witness List; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mark Allen Feldman (Attorney)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Summons Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by null
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial and Final Status Conference) Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mark Allen Feldman (Attorney)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference); Non-...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Continu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Post-Mediation Status Confere...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference ; OSC Re Dismissal-Settlement [??])) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Settlement Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Mediation Setting Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review (Dept. 58 to make arrangements for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Joint Witness List Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Ex Parte Application for an Order to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of the Order Granting the Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Declaration (of David J. Sire re: Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, Fin...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates) of )
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference)))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference ; OSC Re Dismissal-Settlement [??]))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference); Non-...))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of )
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference)))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of )
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Mediation Setting Conference)))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Assignment to Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, Fin...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice (of the Order Granting the Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (of David J. Sire re: Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Advancing and Vacating Dates))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Continu...))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/28/2020)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/05/2021)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference)))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference); Non-...))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 04/05/2021)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Mandatory Settlement Conference) of 08/03/2021)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; MSC Setting Conference)))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference ; OSC Re Dismissal-Settlement [??]))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Mediation Setting Conference)))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Assignment to Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Continue) Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, Fin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Witness List Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice Filed by D.D. Reinforcing (Plaintiff); SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of the Order Granting the Ex Parte Application) Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Arch Insurance Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management) Filed by AWI Builders, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Continu...))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...) of )
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Hearing(s) Due to C...))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Assignment to Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.