Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Xxxxxxxxxxxxxxxxxx, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kellogg Carol D. Esquire, against Target Corporation, represented by Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time225 days |
COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; NEGLIGENCE; PREMISES LIABILITY
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS -
Date: December 29, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT
Date: January 23, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT;DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: February 02, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 10, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 23, 2018Answer
Date: February 02, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: August 10, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.