Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Karnikian Karnik, Manoukian Emma, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Corcoran J. Conor, Weinstock Jared, against Alta Los Angeles Hospitals Inc Dba Los Angeles Community Hospital, Capitulo Edgardo M.D., represented by Hoffman Brian Lee, Reback Robert C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 21, 2018Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice On Application ...)
Date: November 19, 2018Notice - Notice Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: December 06, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 2) NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION 3) LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: December 29, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2018Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice (Demurrer and Motion to Strike) Filed by Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice On Application ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice On Application ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration Filed by Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Ruling Re: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Conor Corcoran for Plaintiffs Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Alta Los Angeles Hospitals, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by Karnik Karnikian (Plaintiff); Emma Manoukian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Edgardo, M.D. Capitulo (Defendant)
Date: November 06, 2019Complaint
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Order (on Ruling Re: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of L. Conor Corcoran for Plaintiffs)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice On Application ...))
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice On Application ...))
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Ruling Re: Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Conor Corcoran for Plaintiffs
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice (Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 06, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.