Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brandt Donald K., Brandt Tzipora, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tamer Steven M. Esq., against John Does 1 To 50, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, Nbs Default Services Llc, Us Bank National Association As Trustee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time88 days |
Notice of Related Cases -
Date: January 09, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 28, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2018Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.