Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Maddox Damon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fca Us Llc, represented by Schirm Barry R. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 21, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00SUMMONS -
Date: November 21, 2017COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS
Date: November 21, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: November 28, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 29, 2017NOTICE OF REMOVAL
Date: December 20, 2017Minute Order -
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW
Date: January 05, 2018NOTICE THAT FEDERAL COURT REMOVED CASE IS STILL ACTIVE
Date: March 21, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 27, 2018Notice of Removal to Federal Court Filed by FCA US, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Damon Maddox (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.