Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Firoozeh Fariborz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steven B. Esq., against Nissan North America Inc, represented by Thomas Anthony S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time291 days |
SUMMONS -
Date: November 13, 2017COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY
Date: November 13, 2017DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 13, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 21, 2017NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER
Date: December 11, 2017DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 15, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Date: January 26, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: February 05, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: March 12, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: February 08, 2018Minute Order -
Date: February 20, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: March 12, 2018Minute Order -
Date: March 12, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: June 29, 2018REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -
Date: August 31, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: June 29, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 31, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.