Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Raeisi Group Inc., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Burrows Lee Eugene, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or, Assured Lender Services Inc., Hovsepian Erik, Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, U.S. Bank National Association, (total of 6) See All represented by Attlesey Storm Llp, Coffee William Daniel Esq., Paino Esq. Brian A., Sharma Esq. Dhruv M., Burrows Lee Eugene, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions319 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
Declaration - Declaration of Rick Favela In Support of Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees
Date: December 03, 2018Opposition - Opposition TO DEFENDANTS’ COMBINED MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY’S FEES
Date: January 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: January 22, 2019Reply - Reply Brief to Defendants Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants Combined Motion
Date: February 04, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 29, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE E. BURROWS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE
Date: June 29, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 01, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: August 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO FILE SECOND AMENDED C...)
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTIONS)
Date: August 01, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: September 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE
Date: September 29, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 18, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 18, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: October 19, 2022Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: October 18, 2022Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 04, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); HE...)
Date: November 14, 2022Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 15, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 20, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 05, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS
Date: April 18, 2023Motion to Tax Costs
Date: May 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: July 17, 2023REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 16, 2018VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CANCELLATION OF INSTRUMENTS 2.QUIET TITLE, ETC
Date: August 06, 2018DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2018Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VELOCITY COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, LLC?S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) AMENDED
Date: September 06, 2022DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO VERIFIRED COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: April 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT VELOCITY COMERCIAL CAPITAL, LLC'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 17, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 05, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 14, 2022Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other :A hearing on the Court's Own CCP 4...)
Date: November 09, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: September 20, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO U.S. BANK'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH...)
Date: November 17, 2022Objection
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling re Preliminary Injunction and Issuance of Notice of an...))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Other - (Notice of and Setting of the Court's Own Motions Under CCP Sections 436 and 438)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO COURT'S SUA SPONTE MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND/OR FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Errata for Plaintiff's opposition to Court's Sua Sponte Motions to Strike...
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other :A hearing on the Court's Own CCP 4...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/09/2018)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Declaration of Dhruv M. Sharma in Support of Defendants' Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Declaration of Rick Favela In Support of Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Appeal By Plaintiff Raeisi Group, INC)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/07/2019)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (Of Lee E. Burrows in Support Of Plaintiff's Opposition To Motion For Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration Of William D. Coffee I Support Of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (To Defendants' Combined Motion For Award Of Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff Raeisi Group, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Reply (Brief to Defendants Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants Combined Motion)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default (NOA:12/21/18 B293744)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA:12/21/18 B293744)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Default (NOA 12/21/18)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default (NOA: 12/21/18 B295818)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA:12/21/18-U B295818)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Appellate Order Granting Relief from Default (NOA:12/21/18 B293744)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 12/21/18, "U")
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Declaration ( of Lee E. Burrow in Support of Plaintiff's Objections)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Objection ( to US Bank's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.