Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wallace Christina S., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Empting Erin N. Esq., against Davis Wright Tremaine Llp, Parker Travis, represented by Capel Julie M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time430 days |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 30, 2017DEFENDANT TRAVIS PARKER'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF CHRISTINA WALLACE
Date: January 05, 2018JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/15/2018)
Date: November 15, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 03, 2019Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: November 15, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: November 13, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.