Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Duran Margaret, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Wasserman Michael E. Esq., against Elsherif Ismail I. D.D.S., represented by Haggerty William C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 24, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time814 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 25, 2018Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 03, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 03, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: May 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: May 28, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2018Receipt
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (For Continuing Trial And All Trial Related Dates)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (stip and order to continue trial)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Ismail I Elsherif)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Shirley Carpenter Bridwell)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Continuing Trial And All ...))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Barton Kubelka)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 15, 2020Notice (Notice Of Entry Of Judgment)
Date: January 21, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.