Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez Roxanne, Redwood Restaurant Group, Torices Basilio, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Urick Nick A, against Fourth Street Mill, Redwood Bar & Grill, Roe Corporations 11 To 20, Uzeta Christina M., Uzeta Christopher, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management631 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions683 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time683 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 14, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: April 27, 2018VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC
Date: October 02, 2017Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: March 26, 2019Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: June 25, 2019Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: August 22, 2018Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 08/16/2019)
Date: August 16, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: August 16, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.