Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Heard Coree, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grayson Stephen Preston, against Ochoa Ericka, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time547 days |
COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: October 02, 2017Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 02, 2019Answer Filed by Ericka Ochoa (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 02, 2019Complaint Filed by Coree Heard (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 02, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 04/02/2019)
Date: April 02, 2019Complaint
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.