Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Etinson Barbara, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bowse Michael Andrew, against Calvert Jay, Fertik Michael, Md Insider Inc., Norris David, Tall Tree Digital Health Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Boden Gregory Peter, Casamassima Christopher T., Cestero Ricardo P, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J. Kleifield Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management216 days |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions320 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order re Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jay Calvert (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of entry of judgment; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. BOWSE; EXS. A-C; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jay Calvert (Defendant); MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Declaration of Brian Lee; Filed by: Jay Calvert (Defendant); MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Reply In Support of Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: January 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Declaration of Ricardo P Cestero; Filed by: Jay Calvert (Defendant); MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to plaintiff's second amended complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Declaration of Ricardo P. Cestero in Support; Filed by: MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jay Calvert (Defendant); MD Insider, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration of Order Sustaining Demurrer; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Jennifer Sebring CSR 13749; Filed by:
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Barbara Etinson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B308312; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 20, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B308312; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MD INSIDER INC (Defendant); JAY CALVERT (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: MD INSIDER INC (Defendant); JAY CALVERT (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 170.6
Date: February 05, 2018STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 05, 2018NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: July 03, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling on Demurrer and Motion to Strike
Date: December 14, 2018Motion for Reconsideration - Motion for Reconsideration of Order Sustaining Demurrer
Date: December 31, 2018Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: April 02, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...)
Date: December 10, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: December 29, 2020Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 01, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: January 12, 2021COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC
Date: September 22, 2017PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: November 28, 2017STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON
Date: January 08, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2018NOTICE OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDEJ) COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 05, 2018SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC
Date: September 10, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Complaint (First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Complaint (Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL FROM REPRESENTATION)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Strike Paragraph 72 of the Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( to Continue Date of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration (of Order Sustaining Demurrer)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Case Management Confer...))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion for Reconsideration of Order)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Ricardo P Cestero)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Lee)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application of...))
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Ricardo P. Cestero in Support)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (of Defendant MD Insider, Inc. for an Order Allowing Defendants Motion)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Pursuant to CCP 4...))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Pursuant to CCP 437c(h))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2020)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. BOWSE; EXS. A-C)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Judgment (IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS (ENTIRE ACTION))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 10/13/20 B308312)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/06/2020)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice (of entry of judgment)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Order (re Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/05/2020)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (2nd Amended Complaint and File 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.