Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flores Sergio, Flores Veronica, Sanchez Ramon, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Zelig Steven L., against Better Floors And Restoration, Blake Dennis, Blake Enterprises Inc. Dba Disaster Kleenup Better Floors & Restoration, Blake Services Inc., Park Sunhee, (total of 11) See All represented by Barnes Craig Alan, D'Andrea Michael A Jr, Master Anne Marie, Mcguire Michael John, Mcnamara Kevin Patrick, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management676 days |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time910 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 24, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 25, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 26, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 31, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 22, 2019NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT TRC INVESTMENTS, LLC D/B/A SERYPRO OF DOWNEY?S MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: September 06, 2018Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 24, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: November 06, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, BLAKE ENTERPRISES, INC., BLAKE SERVICES...)
Date: November 20, 2018Ex Parte Application - Ex Parte Application for a Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Date
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Motion for Summary Judg...)
Date: December 11, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 15, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 21, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 08, 2019Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: May 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (BLAKE))
Date: June 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 14, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: March 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR
Date: February 20, 2020DEFENDANT TRC INVESTMENTS, LLC D/B/A SERVPRO OF DOWNEY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2018DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2018DEFENDANT STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 27, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, BLAKE ENTERPRISES, INC., BLAKE SERVICES...))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) of 11/20/2018)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Motion for Summary Judg...))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing Date)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration (In Support)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice (Index Of Exhibits)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant TRC Investments, LLC d/b/a Servpro of Do...))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: related cases;))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;) of 03/20/2019)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Dean B. Solomon in Support Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Order (HEARING 1-23-20)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 01/23/2020)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Determining Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice ( Of Taking Motion For Summary Judgment Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: March 24, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Response (Delcaration of Anne M. Master in Response to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application an or der continuing the hear...))
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Blake)) of 06/14/2019)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Blake)))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment and Related Orders)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice (of Reassignment of Case and Related Orders; Notice of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference) of 08/02/2019)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order REGARDING SETTING TRIAL DATES;))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to Defendant Sunhee Park, from complaint, only)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Request (for an Order Allowing Telephonic Appearance at Mandatory Settlement Conference (No Order))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MS...))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Trial Setting Order
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (as to Complaint by Plaintiff Ramon Sanchez ONLY)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order (Determining Good Faith Settlement (Code of Civil Procedure ¿ 877.6(a)(2)))
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to TRC Investments LLC, DBA Servpro of Downey, only)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Evidence Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order (Hearing 2-20-20)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Defendant State Farm's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice (of Defendants of Continuance of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Dean B. Solomon)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/20/2020)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.