Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Core Fitness Llc, Core Health & Fitness Llc, Core Industries Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Callahan Daniel J., against Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum Llp, Nat'L Union Fire Ins. Comp. Of Pitts Pa, represented by Furman Dana H., Gessin Jesse Asher, Kazemi Nahal, Keller Jennifer Lynn, Sager Linda L., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management339 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions375 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time957 days |
Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Declaration of Samuel J. Morris; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice of intent to appear by telephone; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Declaration of Ron Mann; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Document:Order-Protective Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Other - Amended Final Ruling Re: Motions for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Other - Ruling Re: Motions for Summary Adjudication/Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Declaration of John D. Van Ackeren in Support; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Other - Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Seal and Non-Party's Motion to Seal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum, LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision; Filed by: Stephen J. Sundvold (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Declaration Declaration; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Declaration OF DANA H. FURMAN; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Declaration of Drew P. Rosell in Support of National Union's Reply; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Nat'l Union Fire Ins. Comp. of Pitts, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Association of Attorneys Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Reimbursement of Fees Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Order; Filed by: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgg, PA (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Bassi Edlin Huie & Blum LLP (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Core Health & Fitness LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANA FURMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Date: November 19, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT & LASC RESERVATION ID
Date: November 19, 2019Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS FILED CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL
Date: December 02, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CORE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION
Date: December 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS)
Date: February 03, 2020Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL AND NON-PARTY'S MOTION TO SEAL
Date: February 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - RESERVATION ID #...)
Date: February 14, 2020Other - - OTHER - RULING RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION/JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2020Other - - OTHER - AMENDED FINAL RULING RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: February 24, 2020COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INSURANCE BAD FAITH; ETC
Date: September 22, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 26, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 03, 2018Answer - Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: June 10, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2019Complaint
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Reimbursement of Fees
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Drew P. Rosell in Support of National Union's Reply)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Compel)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM, LLP'S MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITION)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion To Compel Further Responses To Requests For Production of Documents, Set Three)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Re: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoena
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Re: Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Ross C. Dwyer in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Deposition Subpoena From Navigators Insurance Company)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel compliance with deposition subpoe...))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/10/2019)
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Moti...))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to appoint discovery referee))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Samuel J. Morris in Support of Defendant National Union's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Nicholas B. Salerno In Support of Defendant National Union's Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Dates...))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion ( FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Samuel J. Morris in Support of National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh PAs Reply)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an Order Continuing Heari...))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel); Hearing on Ex...))
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Certificate (Consent and Certification of Referee)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion for Summary Judgement & LASC Reservation ID)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Dana Furman in support of Motion for Summary Judgement)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/27/2019)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Confidential Records Filed Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (of John D. Van Ackeren in Support)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Core's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Fourth Cause of Action)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/06/2019)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Re Scheduling of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Plaintiff?s Fifth And Sixth Causes Of Action)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Reply (To Opposition To Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Plaintiff?s Fourth Cause Of Action)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Confidential Records))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Hearing of Motions for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Other - (Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Seal and Non-Party's Motion to Seal)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Other - (Ruling Re: Motions for Summary Adjudication/Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Reservation ID #...))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/20/2020)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Other - (Amended Final Ruling Re: Motions for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of Order)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (re Continuance of Hearing and Order)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- AS TO ENTIRE ACTION)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Declaration (of James Hazlehurst in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Navigators Insurance Company s Opposition to National Union Fire Ins. Co's Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Navigators Insurance Company's Response to Separate Statement
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (for In Camera Review)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Dates...))
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Hearing on Motion to C...))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to National Union Fire Insurance Company?s Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Morse)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Ron Mann)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF?S FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Linda Sager)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFF?S FIFTH AND SIXTH CAUSES OF ACTION)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 7 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (4 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (5 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 3 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 8 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 9 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 6 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 2 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits (Vol. 1 of 9))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF (CORE HEALTH & FITNESS, LLC...))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue (1) Hearing On Mo...))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue (1) Hearing On Motions For Summary Adjudication And (2) Trial)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)])
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE: PMQ DEPOSITION NOTICE AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/22/2019)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)])
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.