Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aufdemberg Kristen, Auner Lucy, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Goldberg Terry Michael Esq., against County Of Los Angeles, represented by Ferguson Nohemi Gutierrez Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management144 days |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LUCY AUNER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: LUCY AUNER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 17, 2021NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' PITCHESS MOTION
Date: August 02, 2018DEFENDANTS DECLARATIONS AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 04, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (AGAINST PLAINTIFF KRI...)
Date: November 22, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 10, 2019Order - ORDER RE COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING HELD ON 11/22/19
Date: December 03, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION AND INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 10, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. WHISTLEBLOWER RETALIATION ;ETC
Date: September 08, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Date: October 11, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 19, 2019ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: October 24, 2017Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 07, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)
Date: February 10, 2020Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: LUCY AUNER (Plaintiff); KRISTEN AUFDEMBERG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Brief Order to Show Cause Report; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: LUCY AUNER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Order re Court's Order on Motion for Summary Judgment hearing held on ; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LUCY AUNER (Plaintiff); KRISTEN AUFDEMBERG (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO OBTAIN PERSONNEL RECORDS (PITCHESS MOTION)
Date: July 24, 2018DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 04, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Stay Entire Case)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Joint Stipulation to continue s...))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of the Stay))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Brief (Order to Show Cause Report)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Juliana Amaya, CSR#13099)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendant's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Objection ( to Defendant's Separate Statement of Undisputed Materials Facts)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (CAPTAIN KIMBERLY UNLAND, VOLUME 2, DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO LIFT THE STAY AND CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application WITH JOINT STIPULATION FOR A...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Against Plaintiff Kri...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO SHORTEN TIME TO CONTINUE M...))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (and Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Reply (Defendant?s Response to Plaintiff?s Additional Statement of Undisputed Facts)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRADLEY C. GAGE IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER EVIDENCE IN DEFEDANT'S REPLY)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice ( OF RULING REGARDING EX PARTE HEARING)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply in Further Support of Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Brief (Appendix of Evidence in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Objection (TO NOHEMI FERGUSON?S DECLARATION)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/05/2019)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In-Camera Hearing))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re In Camera Hearing))
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Order (re Court's Order on Motion for Summary Judgment hearing held on 11/22/19)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (In-Camera Hearing))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (and Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-02T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.