Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sherman Ruby C., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Bliss Essence Page Trustees Of The Wbp, Finch Dezaree Sherman, Finch Kenathius, Lending Evoque, Luhrassebi Eddie, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2017 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time156 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: December 11, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.