Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carcamo Gustavo, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Hull Ann A. Esq., against Ingenious Asset Group Inc, represented by P.C. Jackson Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Deirdre Hill presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management185 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time227 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 20, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 20, 2017COMPLAINT: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: September 05, 2017DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2017OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: April 16, 2018Order
Date: March 09, 2018Receipt
Date: March 12, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: April 20, 2018Declaration
Date: June 29, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.