Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shido Elizabeth, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Starr Robert L. Esq., against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert L. Hess Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management88 days |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions138 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 18, 2017COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY ;ETC
Date: September 01, 2017OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 18, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: October 16, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: November 29, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.