Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Estrada Axel, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hofman Richard Esq., against Heflin Stephin, Vann Holdings Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Fahey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time238 days |
Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 20, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: October 03, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 13, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: October 16, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 30, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE: OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF STEPHEN HEFLIN
Date: December 29, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE; ETC.
Date: February 21, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. CONVERSION; ETC
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO [COMPEL OF.FCALENDAR
Date: February 27, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: September 19, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: September 15, 2017ANSWER OF DEFENDANT VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC. TO COMPLAINT OF AXEL ESTRADA
Date: December 14, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC.
Date: December 14, 2017AMENDED VERIFICATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC.; PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT; PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2018Complaint Filed by Axel Estrada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC.-DOE 1 (Attorney)
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Stephin Heflin (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Axel Estrada (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC.-DOE 1 (Attorney)
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial William Fahey 10:00 am | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference William Fahey 9:30 am | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00 | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) - Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Post Mediation Status William Fahey 8:30 am | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.