Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kravetskaya Ramida, Kravetskiy Felix, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Kovalevsky Marina M.D., represented by Chihara Tyson, Mcandrews Thomas F. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 25, 2017 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time489 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 25, 2018PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) ;ETC
Date: August 25, 2017DEFENDANT MARINA KOVALEVSKY, M.D.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2018Declaration
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.