Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson Lisa R., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lundy Albro L. Iii Esq., against Albright Clifton W, Albright Yee & Schmit, Johnson Bobby Q, represented by Sacks Glazier Franklin & Lodise Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time979 days |
Separate Statement; Filed by: ALBRIGHT YEE & SCHMIT (Defendant); CLIFTON W ALBRIGHT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: LISA R. JOHNSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: LISA R. JOHNSON (Plaintiff); As to: BOBBY Q JOHNSON (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Joint Statement Re: Mediation; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LISA R. JOHNSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ALBRIGHT YEE & SCHMIT (Defendant); CLIFTON W ALBRIGHT (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 24, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 28, 2017Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: April 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: June 28, 2019Notice - Notice OF TAKING MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR
Date: January 30, 2020COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY ;ETC
Date: August 22, 2017Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance Pursuant to Stipulation)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice ( OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice ( of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance Pursuan...))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Informal Discovery Conference Off Calendar)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 27, 2020Order (Determining Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR ENTRY OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ORDER)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00AS TO DEFENDANTS CLIFTON ALBRIGHT AND ALBRIGHT, YEE & SCHMIT, APC
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ENTRY OF GOOD FAITH SETTL...))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.