Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Orloff Blanka, Orloff George, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Curran Alicia Sarah, Rowell John David, against Venneri Alex, Venneri Cristina, represented by Deziel Colleen A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 22, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time773 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: December 29, 2017Notice - Notice Notice of Continuance of Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates
Date: January 17, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE; PERSONAL INJURY) 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC
Date: August 22, 2017Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 18, 2019Notice (Notice of Continuance of Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement))
Date: September 24, 2019Answer
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial and Associated Pre-Trial Deadlines)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial...))
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Order (Granting Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 09/24/2019)
Date: September 24, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: September 24, 2019Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.