Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Saldana Lori, Saldana Mark, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bunch Bruce Monroe Esq., against Facey Medical Group, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Richman Peter S. M.D., represented by Hernandez Rory Michael Esq., Law Yuk Kwong Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorgina T. Rizk Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 21, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 21, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 27, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE AND FOR LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: August 18, 2017Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2019DEFENDANT PETER S. RICHMAN, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: November 01, 2017DEFENDANT FACEY MEDICAL GROUP'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2017Notice of taking off calendar defendants' MSJ; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Patrick Sealy; Filed by: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Rory M. Hernandez; Filed by: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Filed by P...)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Beth Moore, M.D. Filed by: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Amended Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Filed by P...)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant); Facey Medical Group (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Covid-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); As to: Facey Medical Group (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant); Facey Medical Group (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice (of taking off calendar defendants' MSJ) Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center's ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (as to Remaining Defendant, Peter S....)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Covid-19) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial , Including...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Tri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Filed by P...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice Filed by Providence Holy Cross Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: April 04, 2022Exhibit List Filed by Peter S. Richman,, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Covid-19)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial estimated at 5 to 7 days;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 05, 2022in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial , Including...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial dates)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Judgment (proposed in Favor of Providence Holy Cross Medical Center)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Reply (Brief In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Covid-19))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center's ...))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Filed by P...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice (of taking off calendar defendants' MSJ)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Tri...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Covid-19) of )
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Continued Trial and Final Status Conference Dates)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (as to Remaining Defendant, Peter S....))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Continued Trial and Final Status Conference Dates)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Tri...))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice (of taking off calendar defendants' MSJ)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Judgment (proposed in Favor of Providence Holy Cross Medical Center)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center's ...))
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Reply (Brief In Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Covid-19) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial dates)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial , Including...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Covid-19))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Filed by P...))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (as to Remaining Defendant, Peter S....))
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lori Saldana (Plaintiff); Mark Saldana (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.