Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lam Bob, Wang Jialin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Durham Donald, against Fidel Alejo Chris, Saballos Jose Edgardo, represented by Segall-Gutierrez James Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 14, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeOther Court-Ordered Dismissal |
Case Cycle Time569 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 19, 2017Proof of Service Personal Service -
Date: August 15, 2018Reply - Reply to Oposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: May 14, 2018NOTICE OF ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY
Date: May 14, 2018ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: May 17, 2018Reply - to Opposition of Motion to Deem Facts Admitted
Date: July 02, 2018Reply - to Def Alejo Opposition of Motion to Deem Facts Admitted
Date: July 03, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2017ORDER DEEMING MOTIONS SUBSTANTIVELY MOOT;
Date: July 11, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 07, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/14/2019)
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: January 28, 2019Order
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: February 14, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: August 14, 2017Motion
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.