Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shimshiryan Haykaz, Yesayan Ripsime, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rekte Viktors A., against Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Ronald S. Wu M.D., Samourjian Edward M.D. Dismissed, represented by Finlay Campbell H., Fraser Stephen Clark Esq., Kjar James J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions388 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 31, 2017Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: September 27, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 06, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 01, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: January 24, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: February 11, 2019Notice - Notice of Non Opposition re: Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 28, 2019Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 28, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: July 11, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: June 24, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: July 30, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: July 30, 2019COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: August 01, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2017DEFENDANT, RONALD S. WU. M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue Trial)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue Trial))
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Karine Mkrtchyan, ESQ in Support of Defendant Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Anna Chung)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Facts of Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) of 07/30/2019)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Re-Setting Hearing Date on Defendant Wu's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: September 27, 2019Notice (of Non Opposition re: Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lodging Exhibits on CD)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment Re: MSJ)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 01, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; MEMORANDUM O...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Mkrtchyan in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL))
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Order (Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of MSJ of Defendant Wu)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) of 06/24/2019)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) of 07/11/2019)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Affidavit (of Counsel RE Current Address of Plaintiffs)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Summary Judgment off Calendar)
Date: September 27, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.