Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Del Vecchio Daniel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lipeles Kevin A., against Mckenna Motors Torrance Inc. Dba South Bay Bmw And South Bay Mini, represented by Bhandari Jasmin B., Joo Melanie Sung, Scali Christian J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Declaration REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION; Filed by: Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Petition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Noted of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2017NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 10, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: July 26, 2017NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: failure to arbitrate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Noted of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Noted of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: October 28, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Declaration (REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION) Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference (BINDING ordered ))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by McKenna Motors Torrance, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Daniel Del Vecchio (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding October 16, 2018 Arbitration Status Conference)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Noted of Related Case) of 01/03/2020)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: failure to arbitrate))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Noted of Related Case))
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference (BINDING ordered 1/9/2018)))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 04/09/2020)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.