Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chelvaratnam Ravindran, Kachelmyer Alan, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Acocelli Richard A., Bower David E., Elkins Joel E., Ga Weisslaw Llp, Monteverde Juan E., (total of 6) See All against Adva Na Holdings Inc., Adva Optical Networking Se, Bellinger Brian, Bonney Mark J., Diefenderfer Jeannie H., (total of 10) See All represented by Corder Victoria, Oakes Mark, Stokes Peter, Lichtman Joshua David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategorySecurities Litigation Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions32 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Application-Pro Hac Vice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Application-Pro Hac Vice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Supplemental Filing; Filed by: Alan Kachelmyer (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Message Board Posting case anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order tentative ruling adopted as final order (mtn for prel. approv); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Amended Notice) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Alan Kachelmyer (Plaintiff); Ravindran Chelvaratnam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Alan Kachelmyer (Plaintiff); Ravindran Chelvaratnam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Message Board Posting case anywhere; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Order tentative adopted as final order of the court; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Order unsealing conditionally sealed documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling and Preliminary Approval Motion Continuation; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fee RE Juan E. Monteverde to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Ruling; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 18, 2022Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Ruling/Orders; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Declaration of Tina Chiango regarding dissemination of notice to the class; Filed by:
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2018Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Motion - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: August 07, 2018Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION GOVERNING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: September 24, 2018Response - in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class
Date: October 05, 2018Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification)
Date: March 07, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION PRO HAC VICE OF VICTORIA CORDER
Date: May 13, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT
Date: August 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: September 19, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING A MOTION FOR PRELIMINAR...)
Date: November 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTION CONTINUATION
Date: March 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 04, 2020Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: October 06, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: February 23, 2021CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTIES
Date: July 21, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 05, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: August 08, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 06, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: October 11, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -
Date: January 26, 2018Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Response (in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Payment of Annual Renewal Pro H...))
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Completion of Document and Other Written Discovery
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Pro Hac Vice renewal fees for William Patrick Courtney)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Pro Hac Vice renewal fees for Peter Stokes)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing for Class Certification)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Reply (memorandum of points and authorities in further support of Motion for Class Certification)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: failure of defense counsel William Pa...))
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (As to Plaintiff Ravindran Chevaratan Only...)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fee Re Juan E. Monteverde to Appear as counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend All Remaining Deadlines)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (without prejudice, as to plaintiff Ravindran Chelvaratnam ONLY)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (by Court Call)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing for Class Certification)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Order (tentative adopted as final order of the court)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to further extend all remaining deadlines
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Class Certification))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (of David Bower in support of opposition to demurrer)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Order (unsealing conditionally sealed documents)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Order (granting motion for class certification)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Verified Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of Victoria V. Corder
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Order (granting motion pro hac vice of Victoria Corder)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (granting application of Victoria V. Corder to appear pro hac vice)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Message Board Posting (case anywhere)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: receipt of stipulation and ord...))
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: rescheduling Motion for Prelim...))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Notice (of Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fee RE: Michael A. Rogovin to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fee RE Richard A. Acocelli to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Order (tentative ruling adopted as final order (mtn for prel. approv))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: filing additional briefs (due ...))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of David E. Bower in Support of Plaintiff's Supplement)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Brief (In Support Of Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Supplemental Filing
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Order (tentative ruling adopted as final order (prel. approv. of class action settlement))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice (of Submission of Side Agreement for in Camera Review)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of pro hac vice renewal...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re payment of pro hac vice renewal...))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Message Board Posting (case anywhere)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Joshua D. Lichtman RE Removal of William Patrick Courtney as Counsel of Record)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Defendants' Notice of Submission of Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees for Peter Strokes
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/22/2019)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: filing a motion for preliminar...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Other - (Corrected Notice Of Hearing On Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice (of OSC Hearing Vacated)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order (regarding emergency order issued) Based on curr...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Based on current conditions, including, but not ...))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Application of Non-Renewal of Pro Hac Vice Application of Victoria V. Corder
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice) of 07/22/2020)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: the renewal fee of the pro hac...))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Renewal of Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement) of 08/04/2020)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Amended Notice))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Amended Notice) of 08/06/2020)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE DISTRIBUTION REPORT AND AMENDED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal FEE RE: Richard A. Acocelli to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: pro hac vice renewal fee of Mi...))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Supplemental Briefing))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Declaration of Tina Chiango to Address Court's Questions of November 20, 2020
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Motion for Final Approval))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Ruling/Orders
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fee
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00First Amended Judgment
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Entry of Judgment and Setting Non-A...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (Final Report of Distribution of Settlement Funds)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Verified Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of Victoria V. Corder
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.