Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lichtman Mark, The Lichtman Group, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Keller Sloan & Roman Llp, Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman Llp, against Miller Frank, Thomas Silenn, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management167 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Summons
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: December 27, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.