Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, Federal National Mortgage Association Aka Fannie Mae A Federally Chartered Corp., filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Finlay T. Robert Esq., against Akhtar M. Doe 1 As Trustee Of The, Akhtar Sahibzada Aamir, Does 1 To 25, Rashid Mamun, Sahibzada Aamir Akhtar Revocable Trust, (total of 5) See All represented by Herrera Alejandro H., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc Marmaro presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2017 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc North West Dist. |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 27, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 24, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 20, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 29, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 17, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION BY AKHTAR TO MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED
Date: September 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)
Date: September 13, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: September 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR JUDG...)
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 15, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 24, 2018COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: July 05, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: June 12, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 25, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: April 12, 2018Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: May 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: May 31, 2019Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference THOAMS ROBERT FINLAY; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2021Document:Notice-Ruling Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Defendant
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Continuance Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Document:Application-Pub of Summons Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order for Publication; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Publication Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: February 11, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference (THOAMS ROBERT FINLAY) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by AKHTAR, M., (DOE 1) AS TRUSTEE OF THE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Order for Publication Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO SAHIBZADA A AKHTAR REV TRUST ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Sahibzada Aamir Akhtar Revocable Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion Filed by Sahibzada Aamir Akhtar Revocable Trust (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment) Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Deadlines for Motion for Judg...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Submission of proposed Judgmetnt)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Submission of proposed Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request f...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Ruling Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Ruling Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Opposition by Akhtar to Motion to Deem Answers Admitted; Filed by: Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice ( of PENDING ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases ( to LC 094651 (Van Nuys Courthouse East) *Lead ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (by Akhtar to Motion to Deem Answers Admitted) Filed by SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mamun Rashid (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Application-Pub of Summons
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO SAHIBZADA A AKHTAR REV TRUST )
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash (BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT M. AKHTAR TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE AKHTAR TRUST)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request f...))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Motion for Summary Judgment and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Mamun Rashid's Deposition)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael J. Gilligan in Support of Plaintiff, Fannie Mae's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (by Akhtar to Motion to Deem Answers Admitted)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling; Notice of Continued Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Hearing, etc.)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Deadlines for Motion for Judg...))
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Ruling Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Submission of proposed Judgmetnt))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference (THOAMS ROBERT FINLAY)
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice ( of PENDING ACTION )
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases ( to LC 094651 (Van Nuys Courthouse East) *Lead )
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Default Entered (SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR REVOCABLE TRUST; SAHIBZADA AAMIR AKHTAR, AN INDIV )
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney-Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.