Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Irwin Ralph Iii, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Bell Anthony E. Esq., against Clippinger Robert, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time210 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 28, 2017COMPLAINT FOR ACCOUNTING AND BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY
Date: June 29, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 28, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 25, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.