Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ayala Horacio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marrache Hector Antonio Esq., against Boyce Samuel, Clark Katherine, represented by Dineros Jason Cesar Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 03, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions749 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)
Date: February 22, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVE...)
Date: February 24, 2020Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: April 27, 2020Notice - AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: August 10, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Date: September 09, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, FI...)
Date: December 10, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: December 15, 2020COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: July 03, 2017Answer - ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF HORACIO AYALA
Date: June 24, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Application for Order to Publish; Filed by: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff); As to: Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 18, 2021Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Why This Action Should Not ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Application for Publication Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Trial Setting Conference; - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismis...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Including Dismis...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff; Requ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice (of New Handling Attorney) Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: May 18, 2021Application for Publication (for Samuel) Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel As Counsel for Pl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Hector Antonio Marrache, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Samuel) Filed by Horacio Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Katherine Clark (Defendant); Samuel Boyce (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Plaintiff) Filed by Hector Antonio Marrache, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Samuel)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Verified Answers to Form Interrogatories; Request for Monetary Sanctions i
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Setting of Hearing Date on Defendants' Motio...)... COVID-19)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Why This Action Should Not ...))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Trial Setting Conference; - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismis...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Verified Answers to Special Interrogatories; Request for Monetary Sanctions
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice (of New Handling Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;))
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Answer (to Unverified Complaint of Horacio Ayala)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Application for Publication (for Samuel)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 03/30/2020)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC AND RELATED DISCOVERY)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (for Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Including Dismis...))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (the Deposition of Plaintiff; Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff; Requ...))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel As Counsel for Pl...))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.