Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Zavala Daniel, Zavala Luz Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brown Alan C., against Macias Adrian Keinv, Uhivesal Transportation Ll, represented by Ellrod Anthony J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time613 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 27, 2017COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE; LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
Date: June 29, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: March 04, 2019Notice
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2019Receipt
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.