Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gelman Dmitry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Berkovich Gary, Libman Michael Jacob, against Israyelyan Razmik, Seven Seas Smoke House, Seven Seas Smoke House & Catering, represented by Sheedy Christopher Madden, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions975 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time975 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Witness List AMENDED; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case AMENDED; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions Given; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Jury Question #1; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Jury Question #2; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA: B305908; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid FOR APPELLANT'S REP TRANSCRIPT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for New Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2021Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid By Appellant $2510.00; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal NOA: B305908; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Dmitry Gelman (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B305908); Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 30, 2022Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B305908; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep NOA: B305908; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 18, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B305908, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 26, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 05, 2017Motion for Leave - FOR COURT ORDER DIRECTING CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS
Date: October 11, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS; Hearing on Mo...)
Date: December 13, 2018Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: June 07, 2019Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: January 29, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: January 21, 2020Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: March 20, 2020Motion for New Trial
Date: March 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: April 21, 2020Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX; PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 12, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 26, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: July 21, 2020COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: June 27, 2017Answer - to Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings for Order to Specially Set Defendant's M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, FSC, and a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS; Hearing on Mo...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Witness List (AMENDED) Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, fsc, and a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00JOINT PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Harwin, Dept. M, Van Nuys Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case (AMENDED) Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Jury Question (#1) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Appellant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Jury Question (#2) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for New Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Appellate Order Extending Time for Reporter Transcript Prep (NOA: B305908) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid (FOR APPELLANT'S REP TRANSCRIPT) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Motion for New Trial Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B305908) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Stipulation, receipt and Order Re Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B305908, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Appellant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed ((B305908)) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 30, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal (NOA: B305908) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid (By Appellant $2510.00) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (NOA: B305908) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: March 12, 2021Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Notice (of Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings for Order to Specially Set Defendant's M...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave (FOR COURT ORDER DIRECTING CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Order (By the Court Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS; Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, FSC, and Applicable Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Order (By the Court granting ex parte application to continue the trial and related dates)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, FSC, and a...))
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Michael Libman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 04)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 01)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: GOLDEN RULE)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial, fsc, and a...))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Preliminary Joint Trial Exhibit List
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Joint Jury Instructions List
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Deft's MIL No. 9)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: GOLDEN RULE)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Witness List (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00JOINT PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATION FOR DEPOSITION AND FORMER TESTIMONY
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Karen Vilicich, CSR#7634))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP Section 170.6)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (to Judge Harwin, Dept. M, Van Nuys Court, OTR today at 1:30 p.m.)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL LIBMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order to Continue Trial) Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Dmitry Gelman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Jury Question (#2)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Re: Foundation and Admitting into Evidence of Video Recording)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation, receipt and Order Re Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Jury Question (#1)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/06/2020)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 04/27/20 B305908)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/15/2020)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for New Trial) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Reply (to plaintiff's opposition to motion to tax; proposed order)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 04/27/20 B305908)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.