Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yacoubian & Powell Llp, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Powell Stewart Baker, against Infoneuro Group A California Corporation, Marc J. Gedeon A California Professional Law Corporation, represented by Agopoglu Berc, Hasic Halil, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management115 days |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time874 days |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2018DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: September 05, 2018DECLARATION OF HAUL HASIC IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2018Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: April 09, 2019COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 04, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice (Re-Calendared Hearing)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Reply (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: September 13, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Joint Ex-Parte Application By Defendants (Infoneuro Group, A ...))
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Reply (Response to Objection to Evidence)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Order (on Joint Ex Parte Application)
Date: July 10, 2019Stipulation and Order (For Distribution of Interpleader Funds and Dismissal)
Date: November 14, 2019Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: November 01, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.