Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Smith Perris, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Vaziri Siamak, against Dimas Festival Fun Parks-Smartparks-San, represented by Baldwin Rudie Dane, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions753 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 06, 2017Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE AND ORDER
Date: March 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: March 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: March 08, 2019Motion to Join Necessary Party
Date: January 27, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: March 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTY)
Date: March 19, 2021COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC
Date: June 22, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2017Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 28, 2021Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Join Necessary Party; Filed by: Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 3) Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: June 28, 2021Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 2) Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 4) Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by FESTIVAL FUN PARKS-Smartparks-San Dimas (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Join Necessary Party)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of May 28, 2020 Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Perris Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance of May 28, 2020 Hearing))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order re Continuance of May 28, 2020 Hearing)])
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement of Entire ...))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine and Order)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Join Necessary Party))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.