Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paul Rock Produced Llc, Rockferry Paule, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gareeb Alexander S. Esq., against Derosa-Grund Tony, Evergreen Media Holdings Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions762 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time762 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 21, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: January 05, 2018DEFENDANT TONY DEROSA-GRUND'S MOTION TO QUASH
Date: October 11, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: January 05, 2018ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: January 31, 2018ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO BE RELEIVED
Date: January 31, 2018PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRUND'S MOTION TO QUASH
Date: March 07, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: February 07, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MALICIOUS PROSECUTION
Date: June 22, 2017Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 24, 2019Complaint Filed by Paule Rockferry (Plaintiff); Paul Rock Produced,LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Paule Rockferry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Evergreen Media Holdings,LLC (Defendant); Tony Derosa-Grund (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Tony Derosa-Grund (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Paule Rockferry (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Paule Rockferry (Plaintiff); Paul Rock Produced,LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Evergreen Media Holdings,LLC (Defendant); Tony Derosa-Grund (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-15 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Tony Derosa-Grund (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 07/24/2019)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.