Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas Carolyn, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Agello Frank P., Roy Legal Group, Roy Raj D., against Contreras Grecia, Does 1 To 100, The Adult Skills Center, represented by Beach * Cowdrey * Jenkins Llp, Beach Thomas, Pappas Louis W. Esq., Renick Steven J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Fruin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2017 |
CategoryElder/Dependent Adult Abuse Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions423 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeVerdict |
Case Cycle Time524 days |
Notice of Ruling (Ntc of Ruling on Plaintiff's Mtn for an Order Awarding Attorney Fees )
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP -INITIAL JURY FEE DEPOSIT )
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE PROPOSED ORDERS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of M. H. Cooper in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Answer to Complaint (BY DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER )
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Dennis Rutnam in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of deft Grecia Contreras taking mtn for an order staying the taking of depo )
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00List of Exhibits (PLTF'S APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO DEFT TASC'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JDGT )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Opposition Document ((FILED BY ADULT SKILLS CENTER) TO APPL TO APPOINT G.A.L. FOR PLFF )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF FRANK P.AGELIO,ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM PETITION )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE HEATHERLYNN GONZALEZ, 13646 )
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Opposition Document ((FILED BY GRECIA CONTRERAS) TO APPL TO APPT G.A.L. FOR PLFF )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Order (RE RULING )
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Objection Document (DEFT'S OBJ TO PLTF'S EVIDENCE IN OPP TO DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JDGT [180226292774] )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (non service )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Opposition Document (DEFT'S OPP TO PLTF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO.1 )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order (DENYING SKILLS CENTER'S M.S.J. AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR CAROLYN THOMAS GUARDIAN AD LITEM )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Statement of Case
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.6:TO BIFURCATE PUNTIVE DAMAGES; DEC OF ELIGIO J. LUEVANOS )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Verdict-Special
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Statement of Case (DEFT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Statement of Case
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Motion for an Order (Pltf's Amended Attorney Fee Motion Decl of Frank P. Agello, Esq. [18072333597] )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Brief-Reply (Pltf's Reply Brief re Attorney Fee Motion; Memorandum; and Decl of Frank P. Agello, Esq. )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice ([18072333597] )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( GIVEN )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (7 transcripts )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Declaration (OF FRANK P. AGELLO ESQ IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO DEFT TASC'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Plaintiff's Brief re Burden of Proof for Enhanced remedies in a financial Elder Abuse Trial
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 )
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00[Proposed] Further Amended Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (3 transcripts )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00[proposed] Further Amended Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (PLTF'S LOCAL RULE 3.57 DECL OF FRANK P. AGELLO, ESQ., RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO.3 )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Amended Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice (NTC OF PLTF'S NON-OPP AND STIP TO MTN IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 2, 3, 4, 7, 8, 10, 12, 13 )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lisa Calderon in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs ( $37,819.18)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA IN PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 12 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF PLTF'S OPP TO DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMM. JDGT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Statement of Case (GRECIA CONTRERAS' PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATE RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 3 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Reply/Response (DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S ADDT'L UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS [180226292774] )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ((EX-PARTE) APPL TO APPOINT G.A.L. - CIVIL FOR INCOMPETENT ADULT (PLFF) )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.11: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFT'S PRIOR LEGAL ACTIONS )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.10:TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFT'S RESIDENTIAL HISTORY )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT GRECIA CONTRERAS' HALF OF 7-5-18 JURY FEES $118.62 )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Defendant The Adult Skills Center's [Proposed] Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( REFUSED )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 4 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Judgment (ON SPECIAL VERDICT )
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE SANDRA GUERRA, 10977 )
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (RE JGMT ON SPECIAL VERDICT )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Motion for an Order (Notice of Intention to Move for New Trial [CCP 657, et seq] [180907346949] )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT CONTRERAS' HALF OF JURY FEES 6-27-18 THRU 6-29-18 )
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF EFFATA RE 9-5-18 MOTION FOR ATTY FEES )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Amended Jgmt on Special Verdict)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Order (re Denial of Plff Motion for Attorney Fees Under C.C.P. 2033.420(a) Against Deft T.A.S.C.)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Motion for Atty Fees))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Taking Off Calendar Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply Brief Re Attorney Fees Motion [18072333597]
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Costs Allowed) of )
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order ((Motion of Deft T.A.S.C. to Tax Costs; Motion of Deft Contrera...))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re Costs Allowed))
Date: November 26, 2018Order (Awarding Atty Fees to Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Anita Alderson, 11843)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order (entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Judgment ((Amended) on Special Verdict)
Date: November 26, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Anita Alderson 11843)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00List of Exhibits (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (PLTF'S LOCAL RUL 3.57 DEC OF FRANK P. AGELLO, ESQ., RE MTNS IN LIMINE NO.S 1 & 2 )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT CONTRERAS' HALF OF 7-2-18 AND 7-3-18 JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (ROSIE SAMPLES, 12383 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion - Othe...))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: December 20, 2018Change of Hearing Date of Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict and Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 06, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE HEATHERLYNN GONZALEZ, 13646 ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Answer to Complaint (BY DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00List of Exhibits (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (non service ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE PROPOSED ORDERS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP -INITIAL JURY FEE DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Order (RE RULING ) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT WITNESS LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Statement of Case Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Statement of Case Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Order (DENYING SKILLS CENTER'S M.S.J. AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ) Filed by Court
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR CAROLYN THOMAS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00[Proposed] Further Amended Exhibit List Filed by The Adult Skills Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List Filed by The Adult Skills Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( REFUSED ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( GIVEN ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 12, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 27, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: May 18, 2018PLAITJTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTREREAS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 08, 2017PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 ; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; ETC.
Date: May 18, 2018RULING OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: August 23, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF RE ATTORNEY FEES MOTION, ETC
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT
Date: September 07, 2018PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED ATTORNEY FFES MOTION; DECLARATION OF FRANK P. ACELLO, ESQ.
Date: September 17, 2018Notice - Notice of Taking Off Calendar Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment
Date: October 10, 2018Reply - Plaintiff's Reply Brief Re Attorney Fees Motion [18072333597]
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - (Motion of Deft T.A.S.C. to Tax Costs; Motion of Deft Contrera...)
Date: October 17, 2018Reply - Reply in Support of Motion to Strike
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Motion for Atty Fees)
Date: October 26, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; ETC
Date: June 20, 2017DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2017RULING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, ETC
Date: December 21, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: January 03, 2018DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2018[proposed] Further Amended Joint Exhibit List Filed by The Adult Skills Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE SANDRA GUERRA, 10977 ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (ROSIE SAMPLES, 12383 ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (7 transcripts ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (3 transcripts ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Amended Joint Witness List Filed by The Adult Skills Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Verdict-Special Filed by Court
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATE RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 3 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA IN PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 12 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Amended Joint Statement of the Case Filed by The Adult Skills Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 4 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order) Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: December 20, 2018Judgment ((Amended) on Special Verdict) Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: November 26, 2018Request for Judicial Notice ([18072333597] ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (RE JGMT ON SPECIAL VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion - Othe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Motion for Atty Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order (entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Notice (OF EFFATA RE 9-5-18 MOTION FOR ATTY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Order (Awarding Atty Fees to Plaintiff) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Amended Jgmt on Special Verdict) Filed by Grecia Contreras (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re Costs Allowed)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply Brief Re Attorney Fees Motion [18072333597] Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs ( $37,819.18) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Motion of Deft T.A.S.C. to Tax Costs; Motion of Deft Contrera...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Carolyn Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Judgment (ON SPECIAL VERDICT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Costs Allowed) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (non service )
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Order (RE RULING )
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Answer to Complaint (BY DEFENDANT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER )
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ((EX-PARTE) APPL TO APPOINT G.A.L. - CIVIL FOR INCOMPETENT ADULT (PLFF) )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Answer (TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice (of deft Grecia Contreras taking mtn for an order staying the taking of depo )
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE HEATHERLYNN GONZALEZ, 13646 )
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of M. H. Cooper in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document ((FILED BY GRECIA CONTRERAS) TO APPL TO APPT G.A.L. FOR PLFF )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Opposition Document ((FILED BY ADULT SKILLS CENTER) TO APPL TO APPOINT G.A.L. FOR PLFF )
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Dennis Rutnam in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Lisa Calderon in Support of Defendant The Adult Skills Center's MSJ/MSAI )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF FRANK P. AGELLO ESQ IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO DEFT TASC'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (OF PLTF'S OPP TO DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMM. JDGT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS )
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00List of Exhibits (PLTF'S APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF OPP TO DEFT TASC'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JDGT )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Reply/Response (DEFT'S RESPONSE TO PLTF'S ADDT'L UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS [180226292774] )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Objection Document (DEFT'S OBJ TO PLTF'S EVIDENCE IN OPP TO DEFT'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JDGT [180226292774] )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Notice (NTC OF PLTF'S NON-OPP AND STIP TO MTN IN LIMINE NOS. 1, 2, 3, 4, 7, 8, 10, 12, 13 )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (RE PROPOSED ORDERS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE )
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Order (DENYING SKILLS CENTER'S M.S.J. AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.6:TO BIFURCATE PUNTIVE DAMAGES; DEC OF ELIGIO J. LUEVANOS )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.11: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFT'S PRIOR LEGAL ACTIONS )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO.10:TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF DEFT'S RESIDENTIAL HISTORY )
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR CAROLYN THOMAS GUARDIAN AD LITEM )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP -INITIAL JURY FEE DEPOSIT )
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF FRANK P.AGELIO,ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM PETITION )
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00List of Witnesses (JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (PLTF'S LOCAL RUL 3.57 DEC OF FRANK P. AGELLO, ESQ., RE MTNS IN LIMINE NO.S 1 & 2 )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00List of Exhibits (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT LIST OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Statement of Case (DEFT THE ADULT SKILLS CENTER'S [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Opposition Document (DEFT'S OPP TO PLTF'S MTN IN LIMINE NO.1 )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (PLTF'S LOCAL RULE 3.57 DECL OF FRANK P. AGELLO, ESQ., RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO.3 )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Statement of Case (GRECIA CONTRERAS' PROPOSED JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA IN PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 12 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATE RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 3 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (ROSIE SAMPLES, 12383 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE PROPOSED ORDER ON MIL 4 )
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMIINE NO. 12:; ETC.
Date: June 13, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11:; ETC.
Date: May 30, 2018DEFENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' MOTION IN LIMIINE NO. 13:; ETC.
Date: June 13, 2018DEENDANT GRECIA CONTRERAS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: June 14, 2018Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE SANDRA GUERRA, 10977 )
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00[Proposed] Further Amended Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (RE JENNIFER SPEE, 12840 )
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (3 transcripts )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (7 transcripts )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT CONTRERAS' HALF OF JURY FEES 6-27-18 THRU 6-29-18 )
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00[proposed] Further Amended Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( REFUSED )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions ( GIVEN )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT CONTRERAS' HALF OF 7-2-18 AND 7-3-18 JURY FEES )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT DEFT GRECIA CONTRERAS' HALF OF 7-5-18 JURY FEES $118.62 )
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs ( $37,819.18)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Ntc of Ruling on Plaintiff's Mtn for an Order Awarding Attorney Fees )
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply Brief Re Attorney Fees Motion [18072333597]
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice ([18072333597] )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Judgment (ON SPECIAL VERDICT )
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (RE JGMT ON SPECIAL VERDICT )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Motion for an Order (Notice of Intention to Move for New Trial [CCP 657, et seq] [180907346949] )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice (OF EFFATA RE 9-5-18 MOTION FOR ATTY FEES )
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Brief-Reply (Pltf's Reply Brief re Attorney Fee Motion; Memorandum; and Decl of Frank P. Agello, Esq. )
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order (Pltf's Amended Attorney Fee Motion Decl of Frank P. Agello, Esq. [18072333597] )
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order (re Denial of Plff Motion for Attorney Fees Under C.C.P. 2033.420(a) Against Deft T.A.S.C.)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Anita Alderson, 11843)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Anita Alderson 11843)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Motion for Atty Fees))
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Motion of Deft T.A.S.C. to Tax Costs; Motion of Deft Contrera...))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Amended Jgmt on Special Verdict)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion - Othe...))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Order (Awarding Atty Fees to Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Judgment ((Amended) on Special Verdict)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Costs Allowed) of 11/26/2018)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: December 20, 2018Minute Order ((Court Order re Costs Allowed))
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.