Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carter Mable, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Egbase Anthony Obehi Esq., Manu Seddoo, against Anderson L. Adelaide, Haith Aaron, Korb Capital Inc, Shy Rommy, White Larry, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert L. Hess Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 24, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: August 02, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE- BY MAIL
Date: August 02, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 07, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 08, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 16, 2017ANSWER- CONTRACT: TO COMPLAINT OF MARBLE CARTER
Date: August 02, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: August 21, 2017Answer
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 08, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: August 16, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.