Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Atkinson Adelson Loya Ruud & Romo, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Palmer James H. Esq., against Aldridge Cosntruction Inc, Dpr Iron Llc, Avalon Funding Corporation, The State Of California, represented by Law Office Of Brian Ballo, Xavier Becerra Atty General Of California, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Sotelo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions269 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time276 days |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Document:Answer and Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant & X-Deft
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: March 16, 2018Document:Objection Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: March 16, 2018Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00CROSS-DEFENDANT AVALON FUNDING CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2017COMPLAINT INTERPLEADER
Date: June 13, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: March 16, 2018AVALON FUNDING CORPORATION ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: July 14, 2017OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: September 19, 2017ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISCHARGE AND AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: November 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: July 14, 2017SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER
Date: July 26, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND (2) INDEMNITY
Date: July 26, 2017Notice
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Answer and Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.