Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guillen Laurie, Los Angeles City, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Horwith Jeffrey Lee, Horwith Jeffrey L. Esq., Rose Klein & Marias Law Offices Of, against Dexter Kamala, Visions Adolescent Treatment Centers Doe1, Vision Treatment Centers Llc Doe 1, represented by Farmer Case Hack & Fedor, Norton Geoffrey P. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher K. Lui Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management381 days |
Filing DateJune 12, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint in Interpleader Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Laurie Guillen (Plaintiff); As to: Kamala Dexter (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Pltf in Intervention
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 16, 2020Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 04, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: December 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 24, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 21, 2018MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER
Date: April 25, 2018ORDER RE: PITCHESS MOTION
Date: May 30, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: June 12, 2017Other - - Summons on Complaint-in-Intervention
Date: August 14, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853
Date: August 10, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT KAMALA DEXTER
Date: September 05, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT KAMALA DEXTER
Date: October 16, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 09, 2018DFFENDANT VISION TREATMENT CENTER, LLC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 17, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -
Date: September 27, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -
Date: October 09, 2018Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal) of 12/16/2020)
Date: December 16, 2020Order
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: December 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/27/2020)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.