Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alexis Anna, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Waller Jr. Robert A., against Airbnb Inc., represented by Boies Schiller Flexner Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John Shepard Wiley Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Shepard Wiley Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2017 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions326 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time326 days |
Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 11, 2018Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 10, 2018Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 26, 2018Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - -
Date: July 13, 2017Reply - -REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2018Reply - -REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: July 11, 2018Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: August 10, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: June 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.