Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Madikians Aleene, Mccullough Keith E., Wickham Mary C., against David Barton Gym, Meridian Sports Club California Llc, Paulseth & Associates Physical Therapy Inc., Paulseth Stephen G., The Automobile Club Of Southern California, (total of 7) See All represented by Alston & Bird Llp, Hazarabedian Arthur J., Brogan Kevin H., Lapidus Daniel C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management194 days |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2017 |
CategoryEminent Domain/Condemnation (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions208 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time992 days |
Document:Order for Withdrawal Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Declaration of Daniel C Lapidus; Filed by: Meridian Sports Club L.A., LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.1; Filed by: Meridian Sports Club L.A., LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Statement of Tentative Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Automobile Club of So. California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Automobile Club of So. California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Meridian Sports Club L.A., LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Statement of Decision - Tentative; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Statement of Decision (Final); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Automobile Club of So. California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: The Automobile Club of Southern California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Judgment - Interlocutory; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 30, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 18, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION; ETC
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF TRIAL AND MOTION DATES
Date: December 21, 2017RULING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SO CAL ETC
Date: April 17, 2018Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1
Date: March 19, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: August 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: September 16, 2019Complaint - COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: June 09, 2017COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: June 09, 2017Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: June 21, 2017ANSWER OF AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: July 25, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: August 14, 2017Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: August 14, 2017DEFENDANT TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN
Date: September 29, 2017Complaint (in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action [Lis Pendens]
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re: Complaint in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service of Service of Summons
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Statement of Basis of Appraisal and Basis For Deposit
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Notice (of Deposit)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Answer (of Automobile Club of Southern California to Complaint in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint in Eminent Domain)
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Verified Application for Partial Withdrawal of Funds on Deposit
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Order for Withdrawal
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 27, 2022Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal NOA: B299988; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by:
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (O.S.C. re Dismissal of Settled Portions of Case; Final Statu...))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.1)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Appl of M.T.A. Defts to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (re Admissibility of Trial Exhibits)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Bench Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: of Settled Portions of ...))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Statement of Decision ((Final))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ([Proposed] Interlocutory Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Statement of Decision (- Tentative)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re (Final) Statement of Decision) of 06/13/2019)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Statement of Tentative Decision) of 05/21/2019)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Gail Davidson, 12823)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Request (MERIDIAN SPORTS CLUD LA LLCS REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Judgment (- Stipulated Interlocutory Jgmt in Condemnation as to Deft Auto Club of Southern California)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel C Lapidus)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Statement of Tentative Decision))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re (Final) Statement of Decision))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: of Settled Portions ...))
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Objection (Statement of Tentative Decision)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Appl of Plff For Entry Of Final Order Of Condemnatio...))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Application for Final Order of Condemnation)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Withdrawal of Probable Compensation)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Conditional Settlement of Defendant Automobile Club of Southern California)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorneys' Fees)
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Notice of Abandonment of Appeal (NOA:08/09/19 B299988)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Judgment (- Final Judgment in Condemnation)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Application (APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF THE FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff for Final Order of Condemnation)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUED EX PARTE HEARING)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Order (- Final Order of Condemnation)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Appl of Plff For Entry Of Final Order Of Condemnatio...))
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action)
Date: March 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.