Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Heer Tailor, Paoli & Purdy Pc, Wickander Danielle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paoli & Purdy Llp, Paoli William Michael, Purdy Court B., against Caltrans, Caltrans Caltrans, Ekechukwu Adabelle, State Of Calif Dept. Of Transportation, Malibu City Of, (total of 5) See All represented by Delgadillo Paul, Ekechukwu Leroy U, Haith Scott C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management500 days |
Filing DateJune 09, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00First Amended Complaint; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Order Re: Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Appeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit Appellant; Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA: ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ADABELLE EKECHUKWU (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B301808; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA B301808; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 5 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Trial; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); As to: ADABELLE EKECHUKWU (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 18, 2017Motion to Quash -
Date: December 28, 2017MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR DEFENDANT'S TELEPHONE RECORDS
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 09, 2019Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 02, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: August 02, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: October 16, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO T STRIKE AND TO TAX COSTS
Date: October 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)
Date: November 04, 2020Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL MOTION TO SEAL COURT RECORDS
Date: May 19, 2023COMPLAINT FOR INJURIES AND DAMAGES [WRONGFUL DEATHI 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC
Date: June 09, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Date: July 12, 2017Other - - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2017ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CROSS-DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Date: September 28, 2017STPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 25, 2018Complaint Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Malibu, City Of (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Malibu, City Of (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Summons Filed by Malibu, City Of (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Malibu, City Of (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (NOA B301808) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Answer Filed by ADABELLE EKECHUKWU (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA: ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by TAILOR HEER (Appellant); DANIELLE WICKANDER (Appellant)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ADABELLE EKECHUKWU (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 5 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Trial Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B301808) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice (of Further Status Conference) Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by STATE OF CALIF/DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by DANIELLE WICKANDER (Plaintiff); TAILOR HEER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Status Conference Re: Appeal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA )
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION )
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Notice (of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Declaration (COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS BY DEFENDANT THE CALTRANS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Plaintiff's Appendix of Exhibits in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Caltrans
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Declaration ( of Court B. Purdy in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objection to Proferred Evidence of Defendant Caltrans
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Reply to Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Defendant Cal Trans' Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiffs' Evidence
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Reply ( By Defendant Cal Trans To Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference re: Appeal)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA: 10/9/19)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 5 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 10/9/19)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jina Kaye Soto #7783)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (NOA 10/9/19 B301808)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Final Status Conference)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of order granting defendant the People of California motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Managment Conference)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Managment Conference)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Reply (Reply brief in support of Plaintiff's Motion to t Strike and to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Court B. Purdy in Support of Reply Brief to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Status Conference Re: Appeal))
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal))
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment])
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA 10/9/19 B301808)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Further Status Conference)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B301808)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Appeal))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.