Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Collateralized Invest. Acquisitions Llc, Dakarmen Sara, Molina Claudia, Dakarmenjian Elizabette, Dakarmenjian Kivork, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown Joseph Richard, against Collateralized Invest. Acquisitions Llc, Dakarmenjian Avedis Shawn, Dakarmenjian Troud, Dakarmen Sara, Dakarmen Sara Reyner, (total of 8) See All represented by Ghahreman Kyanoush Christophe, Kerr John Dale, Lacey Kevin Shane, The Agopoglu Law Corp. Plc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions292 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1022 days |
Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00(Proposed) Statement of Decision After Court Trial on Cross Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Statement of Decision After Court Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Opposition BY DEFENDANTS TO MOTION; Filed by: Troud Dakarmenjian (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Affidavit Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 377.32; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Document:General Denial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Objection to Selected Portions of Trial Brief; Filed by: Sara Dakarmen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs - Amended; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment Proposed Judgment after Trial]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Default entered as to Avedis (Shawn) Dakarmenjian; On the Complaint filed by ANI KEMKEMIAN ET AL on
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Declaration Amended CCP 377.32 Affidavit Re Deaths of Plaintiffs; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Sara Dakarmen (Defendant); Troud Dakarmenjian (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Setting Hearing Date) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Statement of Decision After Court Trial]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Brief Plaintiff/Cross Defendants Closing Brief; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Claudia Molina (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; Filed by: Ani Kemkemian (Plaintiff)
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 21, 2021PROOFS OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CLAUDIA MOLINA'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 07, 2017Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES & COST (POST-JUDGMENT)
Date: July 20, 2020VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE ;ETC
Date: June 08, 2017Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: June 22, 2020PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT CLAUDIA MOLINA.
Date: March 27, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: October 09, 2020SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2017Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO MOTION
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.
Date: December 29, 2017ANSWER TO VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT SARA DAKARMEN
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANT COLLATERALIZED INVESTMENT ACQUISITIONS, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2018VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE, ETC
Date: October 04, 2017SUMMONS - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: RESCISSION AND RESTITUTION
Date: November 13, 2017SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2017SECOND AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF (QUIET TITLE), ETC
Date: January 08, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: March 23, 2018DEFENDANT'S SARA DAKARMEN VERIFIED ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS PERSONAL
Date: March 12, 2018General Denial
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint (for Damages: Rescission and Restitution)
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Ord, Change/Amend/Correct Name
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Defendant Collateralized Investment Acquisitions, LLC's Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial;))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Judgment (After Trial)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff/Cross Defendants Closing Brief)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Reply (TO DEFENDANT/CROSS- PLAINTIFF'S CLOSING BRIEF.)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (4-Day Estimate)))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00(Proposed) Statement of Decision After Court Trial on Cross Complaint
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Order (Granting Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Statement of Decision (After Court Trial)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Statement of Decision After Court Trial and ...))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Substituting Partie...))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Trial Brief (DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANT SUR REBUTTAL/ BRIEF)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Correction to Plaintiffs' Trial Brief)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Judgment Proposed Judgment after Trial])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Statement of Decision After Court Trial])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter After Trial))
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Trial Brief (DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANT CLOSING ARGUMENT BRIEF (INITIAL))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Substituting Parties)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Setting Hearing Date) of 07/07/2020)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Memorandum (of Costs - Amended)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (BY DEFENDANTS TO MOTION)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice (Case Reassignment and Continued Hearing Date - Mot. Atty Fees)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees) of 10/09/2020)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion for Attorney's Fees & Cost (post-judgment))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (and Supplement to Motion for Atty Fees re 10-9-2020 Minute Order)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Setting Hearing Date))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (Amended CCP 377.32 Affidavit Re Deaths of Plaintiffs)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Affidavit (Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 377.32)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice (of OSC/FSC/Trial Dates)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Objection ( to Selected Portions of Trial Brief)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Of...))
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.