Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chen Hsieh Tsu, Chen Tung Pei, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chang Grace Lea, against Chen Jim Chu-Lung, Evangel Church Of Christ Arcadia, Jelong Real Estate Holding Llc, The Chen And Wu Family Trust, The Jim Chu-Lung Chen Single Trust, (total of 6) See All represented by Burns Nigel John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management228 days |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2017 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions513 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time780 days |
DECLARATION OF BRANDON WYMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2017DEFENDANT STELLA LING-FUNG WU'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 06, 2017DEFENDANT JIM CHU-LUNG CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 06, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC
Date: October 30, 2017DEFENDANT JELONG REAL ESTATE HOLDING, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 06, 2017DEFENDANT YOUNG SUN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: January 09, 2018DEFENDANT JIM CHU-LUNG CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: January 09, 2018DEFENDANT STELLA LING-FUNG WU'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: January 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 10, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 19, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: July 10, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: August 29, 2017AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 27, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: September 21, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: June 27, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 13, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 07, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF ACTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: September 29, 2017NOTICE OF NEW DATES OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: January 31, 2018Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: December 13, 2018Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: January 24, 2019Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Date: February 19, 2019Opposition - Opposition Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement and Stipulated Judgment
Date: February 20, 2019Reply - Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enforce SJ
Date: February 28, 2019Order - COURT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: March 04, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement)
Date: March 05, 2019Order - Order Court's order motion to enforce settlement agreement - Granted.
Date: March 05, 2019COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY ;ETC
Date: June 05, 2017DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: August 29, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Civil Deposit
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order to Enforce Stipulated Judgment)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Application for Order to Enforce Stipulated Judgment;))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for order to enforce stipulated judgment)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Manuel Boxler in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application;)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jim Chen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application;)
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Court's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement and Stipulated Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement; Order to Show Cause ...))
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Enforce SJ)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Nigel Burns Re Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Jim Chen)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Nigel Burns)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Order (Court's order motion to enforce settlement agreement - Granted.)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Ruling ( RK DEFENDANTS'4 MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement))
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Nigel Burns Re OSC Re Dismissal)
Date: July 29, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.